AL HB522 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - Local Legislation first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - Local Legislation first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Russell Co., sheriff authorized to sell certain abandoned, unclaimed, or stolen property, and firearms, notice, record keeping requirement, distribution of funds for law enforcement purposes
Title
Russell Co., sheriff authorized to sell certain abandoned, unclaimed, or stolen property, and firearms, notice, record keeping requirement, distribution of funds for law enforcement purposes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 75 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Senate | Local Legislation first Amendment Offered |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 25 Favorable from Local Legislation with 1 amendment |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2018-03-22 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 974 |
2018-03-22 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-03-21 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-03-20 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |