AL HB526 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-15 - Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-15 - Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Alexander City, corp. limits alt.
Title
Alexander City, corp. limits alt.
Sponsors
Rep. Ed Oliver [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 83 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2019-05-07 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 524 |
2019-05-07 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-02 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-30 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |