AL HB545 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-13 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
Pending: Senate Local Legislation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-13 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
Pending: Senate Local Legislation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Tuscaloosa Co., Road Improvement Commission, duties and operation further provided for, Act No. 56, 1953 Reg. Sess., am'd.
Title
Tuscaloosa Co., Road Improvement Commission, duties and operation further provided for, Act No. 56, 1953 Reg. Sess., am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-13 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 736 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 77 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2021-04-13 - House - HBIR: Wingo motion to Adopt Roll Call 735 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 59 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2021-04-13 - House - HBIR: Wingo motion to Adopt Roll Call 735 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 59 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2021-04-13 | House | South intended to vote "Yea" |
2021-04-13 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 736 |
2021-04-13 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-04-01 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-03-16 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Tuscaloosa County Legislation |
Same As/Similar To
SB336 (Same As) 2021-04-15 - Assigned Act No. 2021-279.