AL HB562 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Delivered to Governor at 11:52 a.m. on April 22, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Delivered to Governor at 11:52 a.m. on April 22, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Geneva Co., service of process on out-of-state cases, sheriffs fee, set by county commission, distrib. to sheriff's office
Title
Geneva Co., service of process on out-of-state cases, sheriffs fee, set by county commission, distrib. to sheriff's office
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1115 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - SBIR: Chesteen motion to Adopt Roll Call 1114 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 732 (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 74 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2021-04-13 - House - HBIR: Sorrells motion to Adopt Roll Call 731 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 52 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2021-04-22 - Senate - SBIR: Chesteen motion to Adopt Roll Call 1114 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 732 (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 74 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2021-04-13 - House - HBIR: Sorrells motion to Adopt Roll Call 731 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 52 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-22 | House | Delivered to Governor at 11:52 a.m. on April 22, 2021. |
2021-04-22 | House | Assigned Act No. 2021-324. |
2021-04-22 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2021-04-22 | House | Enrolled |
2021-04-22 | House | Passed Second House |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1115 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2021-04-13 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 732 |
2021-04-13 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-04-01 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-03-18 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |