AL HB569 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-03 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
Pending: Senate Finance and Taxation General Fund Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-03 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
Pending: Senate Finance and Taxation General Fund Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Home Medical Equipment Services Providers, Board of, name changed to Home Medical Equipment, Board of, duties revised, licensure and regulation, disciplinary hearings, administrative fines, injunctions, penalties, Secs. 34-14C-1, 34-14C-2, 34-14C-4, 34-14C-4.1, 34-14C-5, 34-14C-6, 34-14C-8 am'd
Title
Home Medical Equipment Services Providers, Board of, name changed to Home Medical Equipment, Board of, duties revised, licensure and regulation, disciplinary hearings, administrative fines, injunctions, penalties, Secs. 34-14C-1, 34-14C-2, 34-14C-4, 34-14C-4.1, 34-14C-5, 34-14C-6, 34-14C-8 am'd
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-05-04 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-05-04 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-03 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund | |
2012-05-02 | Engrossed | |
2012-05-02 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1144 | |
2012-05-02 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1143 | |
2012-05-02 | Boards, Agencies and Commissions Amendment Offered | |
2012-05-02 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-12 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment | |
2012-03-20 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions |