AL HB58 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Lamar County, judge of probate, salary, uniform cost-of-living increases.
Title
Lamar County, judge of probate, salary, uniform cost-of-living increases.
Sponsors
Rep. Tracy Estes [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-21 - House - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 51 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-02-21 - House - Passed House Of Origin (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 51 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-02-21 - House - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 64 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2024-02-21 - House - Passed House Of Origin (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 51 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-02-21 - House - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 64 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Pending Senate Local Legislation |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Local Legislation |
2024-02-21 | House | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-02-21 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 53 |
2024-02-21 | House | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-02-20 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-02-20 | House | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-02-06 | House | Pending House Local Legislation |
2024-02-06 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Local Legislation |
2024-01-12 | House | Prefiled |