AL HB59 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-20 - Delivered to Governor at 10:12 a.m. on March 20, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-20 - Delivered to Governor at 10:12 a.m. on March 20, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Veterinary Medical Examiners, Alabama State Board of, Sunset Law Review, continued until October 1, 2017
Title
Veterinary Medical Examiners, Alabama State Board of, Sunset Law Review, continued until October 1, 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-15 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-20 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:12 a.m. on March 20, 2013. |
2013-03-20 | House | Assigned Act No. 2013-72 on 03/26/2013. |
2013-03-20 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2013-03-19 | House | Enrolled |
2013-03-14 | House | Passed Second House |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 229 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Children, Youth Affairs, and Human Resources |
2013-02-26 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 76 |
2013-02-26 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-02-06 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-02-05 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions |