AL HB59 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-04 - Delivered to Governor at 2:29 p.m. on March 4, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-04 - Delivered to Governor at 2:29 p.m. on March 4, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Geologists, Board of Licensure for Professional, sunset law review, continued until Oct 1, 2025.
Title
Geologists, Board of Licensure for Professional, sunset law review, continued until Oct 1, 2025.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 419 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - SBIR: Barfoot motion to Adopt Roll Call 418 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 178 (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - HBIR: Shedd motion to Adopt Roll Call 177 (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - SBIR: Barfoot motion to Adopt Roll Call 418 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 178 (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - HBIR: Shedd motion to Adopt Roll Call 177 (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-04 | House | Delivered to Governor at 2:29 p.m. on March 4, 2021. |
2021-03-04 | House | Assigned Act No. 2021-67. |
2021-03-04 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2021-03-04 | House | Enrolled |
2021-03-04 | House | Passed Second House |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 419 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |
2021-02-25 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 178 |
2021-02-25 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-02-24 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions |