AL HB60 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education Policy
Pending: Senate Education Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Revenue Dept, income tax refunds, set off debt collection, public institutions of higher education as claimant agencies under certain conditions, Sec. 40-18-100 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revenue Dept, income tax refunds, set off debt collection, public institutions of higher education as claimant agencies under certain conditions, Sec. 40-18-100 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-03 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education Policy
2020-03-03HouseEngrossed
2020-03-03HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 190
2020-03-03HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 189
2020-03-03HouseState Government Amendment Offered
2020-03-03HouseThird Reading Passed
2020-02-20HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2020-02-04HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback