AL HB71 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-18 - Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-18 - Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Elections, voter registration lists, publication by judge of probate on website of co. or Association of Co. Commissioners website, comp., Secs. 17-4-1, 17-4-10, 17-9-5 am'd.
Title
Elections, voter registration lists, publication by judge of probate on website of co. or Association of Co. Commissioners website, comp., Secs. 17-4-1, 17-4-10, 17-9-5 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 67 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-18 | Senate | Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections Amendment Offered |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 16 Favorable from Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections with 1 amendment |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections |
2014-02-04 | House | Bracy voted "Yea" and intended to vote "Abstain" |
2014-02-04 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 133 |
2014-02-04 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-01-16 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-01-14 | House | Rereferred from Constitution, Campaigns and Elections to County and Municipal Government |
2014-01-14 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution, Campaigns and Elections |