AL HB71 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Delivered to Governor at 1:06 p.m. on March 22, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Delivered to Governor at 1:06 p.m. on March 22, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Education Dept. of, Early Childhood Education, Secretary, qualifications, Sec. 26-24-2 am'd.
Title
Education Dept. of, Early Childhood Education, Secretary, qualifications, Sec. 26-24-2 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | House | Delivered to Governor at 1:06 p.m. on March 22, 2018. |
2018-03-22 | House | Assigned Act No. 2018-414. |
2018-03-22 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2018-03-22 | House | Enrolled |
2018-03-22 | House | Passed Second House |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1029 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education and Youth Affairs |
2018-01-25 | House | Scott intended to vote "Yea" |
2018-01-25 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 112 |
2018-01-25 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-01-11 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-01-09 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy |