AL HJR136 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-14 - Forwarded to Governor on March 14, 2017 at 4:30 p.m. on March 14, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Girls scouts, 100 years of selling cookies, commended

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Girls scouts, 100 years of selling cookies, commended

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-14HouseForwarded to Governor on March 14, 2017 at 4:30 p.m. on March 14, 2017.
2017-03-14HouseAssigned Act No. 2017-100.
2017-03-14HouseClerk of the House Certification
2017-03-14HouseEnrolled
2017-03-14SenateSignature Requested
2017-03-14HousePassed Second House
2017-03-14SenateWaggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2017-03-14SenateReported from Rules
2017-03-09SenateReceived in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules
2017-03-09HouseBoothe motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2017-03-09HouseReported from Rules
2017-03-07HouseIntroduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback