AL HJR173 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
APOL1-Mediated Kidney Disease Awareness Day; last Tuesday of each April, recognized
Title
APOL1-Mediated Kidney Disease Awareness Day; last Tuesday of each April, recognized
Sponsors
Rep. Laura Hall [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Enrolled |
2024-04-25 | House | Ready to Enroll |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Reported from RULES from Senate RULES |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Pending Senate RULES |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate and referred to the Senate committee on RULES |
2024-04-16 | House | Lovvorn motion to Adopt - Adopted Voice Vote |
2024-04-16 | House | Reported from RULES from House RULES |
2024-04-16 | House | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-04-09 | House | Pending House RULES |
2024-04-09 | House | Received in the House and referred to the House committee on RULES |