AL HJR254 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Delivered to Governor at 3:55 p.m. on May 29, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Delivered to Governor at 3:55 p.m. on May 29, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Clark McClain Bridge, in town of Collinsville, named
Title
Clark McClain Bridge, in town of Collinsville, named
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | House | Delivered to Governor at 3:55 p.m. on May 29, 2019. |
2019-05-29 | House | Assigned Act No. 2019-347. |
2019-05-29 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2019-05-29 | House | Enrolled |
2019-05-29 | House | Passed Second House |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Reported from Rules |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules |
2019-05-28 | House | Jones (M) motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2019-05-28 | House | Reported from Rules |
2019-05-22 | House | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |