AL HJR278 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-18 - Dial motion to Recommit adopted Voice Vote P&PO recommits to Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-18 - Dial motion to Recommit adopted Voice Vote P&PO recommits to Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Central time, urging governments in certain communities in the State of Alabama to observe Central Time Zone
Title
Central time, urging governments in certain communities in the State of Alabama to observe Central Time Zone
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | Senate | Dial motion to Recommit adopted Voice Vote P&PO recommits to Rules |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Dial motion to Reconsider adopted Voice Vote |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Reported from Rules and rereferred to committee Rules |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules |
2014-03-11 | House | McCutcheon motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2014-03-11 | House | Reported from Rules |
2014-03-05 | House | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |