AL HJR278 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Delivered to Governor at 10:27 a.m. on March 15, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Delivered to Governor at 10:27 a.m. on March 15, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Garlen, Joshua, nominee for the 2018 Alabama Legislative Medal of Honor for Law Enforcement, commended
Title
Garlen, Joshua, nominee for the 2018 Alabama Legislative Medal of Honor for Law Enforcement, commended
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:27 a.m. on March 15, 2018. |
2018-03-15 | House | Assigned Act No. 2018-328. |
2018-03-15 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2018-03-13 | House | Enrolled |
2018-03-13 | House | Passed Second House |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Reported from Rules |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules |
2018-03-06 | House | Jones motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2018-03-06 | House | Reported from Rules as Favorable |
2018-03-01 | House | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |