AL HJR37 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Health care workers and nurses, written notice urged that attacking a health care provider is a felony

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health care workers and nurses, written notice urged that attacking a health care provider is a felony

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-02HouseEnrolled
2019-05-02HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:25 a.m. on May 2, 2019.
2019-05-02HouseAssigned Act No. 2019-112.
2019-05-02HouseClerk of the House Certification
2019-05-02SenateSignature Requested
2019-04-30HouseEnrolled
2019-04-30HousePassed Second House
2019-04-30SenateWaggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2019-04-30SenateReported from Rules
2019-04-04SenateReceived in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules
2019-04-04HouseJones (M) motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2019-04-04HouseReported from Rules
2019-03-20HouseIntroduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback