AL HR241 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-27 - Joint Rule 11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-27 - Joint Rule 11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Billa, Justin Taylor, death mourned
Title
Billa, Justin Taylor, death mourned
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-21 - Senate - Livingston motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 72 N: 6 NV: 14 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 68 N: 5 NV: 15 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Livingston motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 72 N: 6 NV: 14 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 68 N: 5 NV: 15 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Livingston motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-27 | House | Joint Rule 11 |