AL SB100 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Board of Medical Scholarship Awards Fund
Title
Establishing the Board of Medical Scholarship Awards Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-19 - House - Passed Second House (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - House - Third Reading Second House (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Passed House Of Origin (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - House - Third Reading Second House (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Passed House Of Origin (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Senate | Enacted |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Enacted |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2024-03-19 | House | Signature Requested |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Ready to Enroll |
2024-03-19 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 254 |
2024-03-19 | House | Third Reading in Second House |
2024-03-06 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-03-06 | House | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-02-27 | House | Pending House Ways and Means Education |
2024-02-27 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means Education |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 97 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Pending Senate Education Policy |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Education Policy |