AL SB11 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-10 - Delivered to Governor at 11:26 a.m. on May 10, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-10 - Delivered to Governor at 11:26 a.m. on May 10, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Elections, political campaigns, phone banks, fraudulent misrepresentation regarding candidates or committees prohibited, investigation and enforcement by Attorney General, penalties, Sec. 17-5-16 am'd. (2012-20196)
Title
Elections, political campaigns, phone banks, fraudulent misrepresentation regarding candidates or committees prohibited, investigation and enforcement by Attorney General, penalties, Sec. 17-5-16 am'd. (2012-20196)
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Reed [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-10 - Senate - Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-10 | Delivered to Governor at 11:26 a.m. on May 10, 2012 | |
2012-05-10 | Assigned Act No. 2012-461. | |
2012-05-10 | Signature Requested | |
2012-05-10 | Enrolled | |
2012-05-10 | Concurred in Second House Amendment | |
2012-05-09 | Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1273 | |
2012-05-09 | Concurrence Requested | |
2012-05-09 | Scott intended to vote "Yea" | |
2012-05-09 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1445 | |
2012-05-09 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1444 | |
2012-05-09 | Constitution, Campaigns and Elections first Substitute Offered | |
2012-05-09 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-01 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and | |
2012-02-16 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution, Campaigns and Elections | |
2012-02-16 | Engrossed | |
2012-02-16 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 83 | |
2012-02-16 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 82 | |
2012-02-16 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 81 | |
2012-02-16 | Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections Amendment Offered | |
2012-02-16 | Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections Amendment Offered | |
2012-02-16 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-02-14 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments | |
2012-02-07 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections |