AL SB122 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Alabama Board of Electrical Contractors, continued until October 1, 2026, with modification to provide for a provisional license, pursuant to the Sunset Law.
Title
Alabama Board of Electrical Contractors, continued until October 1, 2026, with modification to provide for a provisional license, pursuant to the Sunset Law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-21 - Senate - Passed House Of Origin (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-10 | House | Reported Out of Committee Second House from House Boards, Agencies and Commissions FX1R5CC-1 |
2024-04-10 | House | Boards, Agencies and Commissions 1st Amendment SQGM757-1 |
2024-03-21 | House | Pending House Boards, Agencies and Commissions |
2024-03-21 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 264 |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Pending Senate Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |