AL SB130 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Sunset law, Alabama Board of Court Reporting is continued until October 1, 2028
Title
Sunset law, Alabama Board of Court Reporting is continued until October 1, 2028
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-29 - Senate - Passed House Of Origin (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-03-20 | House | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-03-05 | House | Pending House Boards, Agencies and Commissions |
2024-03-05 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 139 |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Pending Senate Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |