AL SB138 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Ready to Enroll
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Ready to Enroll
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Plumbers and Gas Fitters Examining Board, continued until October 1, 2028, without modification, pursuant to the Sunset Law
Title
Plumbers and Gas Fitters Examining Board, continued until October 1, 2028, without modification, pursuant to the Sunset Law
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-30 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Roll Call 899 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - House - Third Reading in Second House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Roll Call 507 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - House - Third Reading in Second House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Roll Call 507 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Senate | Ready to Enroll |
2024-04-30 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 899 |
2024-04-30 | House | Third Reading in Second House |
2024-04-18 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-17 | House | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-04-11 | House | Pending House Boards, Agencies and Commissions |
2024-04-11 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 507 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Pending Senate Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |