AL SB153 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Delivered to Governor at 1:20 p.m. on April 23, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Delivered to Governor at 1:20 p.m. on April 23, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Municipalities, public utilities, contracts between governing body and registered service providers authorized to build, maintain, repair utility systems, Sec. 11-47-3 am'd.
Title
Municipalities, public utilities, contracts between governing body and registered service providers authorized to build, maintain, repair utility systems, Sec. 11-47-3 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - Senate - Sanford motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Sanford motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - Senate - Sanford motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Sanford motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-23 | House | Delivered to Governor at 1:20 p.m. on April 23, 2013 |
2013-04-23 | House | Assigned Act No. 2013-117. |
2013-04-23 | House | Signature Requested |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2013-04-18 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 639 |
2013-04-18 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-03-07 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-02-21 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Engrossed |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 101 |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Sanford motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 100 |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Sanford Amendment Offered |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Smitherman motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Sanford motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 85 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Sanford Amendment Offered |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Smitherman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 84 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Governmental Affairs Amendment Offered |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Smitherman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 83 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Governmental Affairs Amendment Offered |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Third Reading Open |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Governmental Affairs as Favorable with 2 amendments |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |