AL SB153 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-17 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Alabama Network of Statewide Workforce and Education, related statistics, answers, data system established and operated, maintained by Office of Edu. and Workforce Statistics in Dept. of Labor, to provide education and workforce training for Alabama residents, confidentiality protected, advisory board created

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alabama Network of Statewide Workforce and Education, related statistics, answers, data system established and operated, maintained by Office of Edu. and Workforce Statistics in Dept. of Labor, to provide education and workforce training for Alabama residents, confidentiality protected, advisory board created

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-17SenateIndefinitely Postponed
2017-02-21SenateBIR Lost, 14 Yeas, 15 Nays
2017-02-14SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2017-02-09SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback