AL SB164 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Animals, limitations of liability for activities of bovines provided to owners
Title
Animals, limitations of liability for activities of bovines provided to owners
Sponsors
Sen. Randy Price [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Roll Call 572 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Price motion to Adopt - Roll Call 571 NAL5JTT-1 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Price motion to Adopt - Roll Call 571 NAL5JTT-1 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-24 | House | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-04-18 | House | Pending House Judiciary |
2024-04-18 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Judiciary |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Engrossed |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 572 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Price motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 571 NAL5JTT-1 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Agriculture, Conservation, and Forestry 1st Substitute Offered NAL5JTT-1 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Agriculture, Conservation, and Forestry 1st Substitute NAL5JTT-1 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Pending Senate Agriculture, Conservation, and Forestry |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Conservation, and Forestry |