AL SB207 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interstate compact; dieticians
Title
Interstate compact; dieticians
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-11 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Roll Call 495 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-17 | House | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-04-11 | House | Pending House Boards, Agencies and Commissions |
2024-04-11 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 495 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Pending Senate Veterans and Military Affairs |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB317 (Same As) 2024-04-30 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar