AL SB222 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-01 - Delivered to Governor at 5:55 p.m. on June 1, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-01 - Delivered to Governor at 5:55 p.m. on June 1, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Ethics, public officers and employees and family members, clarification that prohibited offer, gift, solicitation, or receipt of anything pursuant to Section 36-25-7, Code of Alabama 1975, must be for corruptly influencing official action, Sec. 36-25-7 am'd.; Act 2010-764, 2010 1st Sp. Sess. am'd.
Title
Ethics, public officers and employees and family members, clarification that prohibited offer, gift, solicitation, or receipt of anything pursuant to Section 36-25-7, Code of Alabama 1975, must be for corruptly influencing official action, Sec. 36-25-7 am'd.; Act 2010-764, 2010 1st Sp. Sess. am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Del Marsh [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-01 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-01 | Delivered to Governor at 5:55 p.m. on June 1, 2011 | |
2011-06-01 | Assigned Act No. 2011-632. | |
2011-06-01 | Signature Requested | |
2011-06-01 | Enrolled | |
2011-06-01 | Passed Second House | |
2011-06-01 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1044 | |
2011-06-01 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-14 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-04-05 | referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ethics and Campaign Finance | |
2011-04-05 | Read for the first time and | |
2011-04-05 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 161 | |
2011-04-05 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-03-31 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-03-22 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections |