AL SB244 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Board of Medical Examiners; "expedited license" defined for purposes of criminal background check for physician licensure
Title
Board of Medical Examiners; "expedited license" defined for purposes of criminal background check for physician licensure
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Roll Call 435 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-24 | House | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-04-11 | House | Pending House Health |
2024-04-11 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Health |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 435 |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Pending Senate Veterans and Military Affairs |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB360 (Same As) 2024-04-25 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 824