AL SB26 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Assigned Act No. 2021-172.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Assigned Act No. 2021-172.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Insurance, property and casualty insurers, appointed actuary to provide annual opinion, exemption from insurance regulator in state where insurer domiciled, Sec. 27-3-26.1 am'd.
Title
Insurance, property and casualty insurers, appointed actuary to provide annual opinion, exemption from insurance regulator in state where insurer domiciled, Sec. 27-3-26.1 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 581 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - HBIR: Rich motion to Adopt Roll Call 580 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 165 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Shelnutt motion to Adopt Roll Call 164 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - SBIR: Shelnutt motion to Adopt Roll Call 163 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - HBIR: Rich motion to Adopt Roll Call 580 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 165 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Shelnutt motion to Adopt Roll Call 164 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - SBIR: Shelnutt motion to Adopt Roll Call 163 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2021-172. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-04-01 | House | Signature Requested |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2021-04-01 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 581 |
2021-04-01 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-02-23 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-11 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Insurance |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Engrossed |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 165 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Shelnutt motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 164 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Banking and Insurance Amendment Offered |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Banking and Insurance |
Same As/Similar To
HB34 (Same As) 2021-05-06 - Indefinitely Postponed