AL SB278 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Public education employees, providing compensation to full-time public education employees, on the job injury program, trust fund, and board created
Title
Public education employees, providing compensation to full-time public education employees, on the job injury program, trust fund, and board created
Sponsors
Sen. Sam Givhan [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Roll Call 556 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Givhan motion to Adopt - Roll Call 555 1W2QZZ3-1 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Givhan motion to Adopt - Roll Call 554 DJR2HTH-1 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Givhan motion to Adopt - Roll Call 555 1W2QZZ3-1 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Givhan motion to Adopt - Roll Call 554 DJR2HTH-1 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-02 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-05-01 | House | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-05-01 | House | Ways and Means Education 1st Substitute WHYD9E9-1 |
2024-04-18 | House | Pending House Ways and Means Education |
2024-04-18 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means Education |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Engrossed |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 556 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Givhan motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 555 1W2QZZ3-1 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Givhan 1st Amendment Offered 1W2QZZ3-1 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Givhan motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 554 DJR2HTH-1 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Finance and Taxation Education 1st Amendment Offered DJR2HTH-1 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Finance and Taxation Education 1st Amendment DJR2HTH-1 |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Pending Senate Finance and Taxation Education |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Finance and Taxation Education |