AL SB28 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Houston County, Houston County Health Care Authority, board members to be appointed by county commission
Title
Houston County, Houston County Health Care Authority, board members to be appointed by county commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-14 - House - LOCAL_CERTIFICATION_RESOLUTION_ADOPTED (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 24 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - Passed Second House (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 20 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - Third Reading Second House (Y: 69 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Passed House Of Origin (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - Passed Second House (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 20 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - Third Reading Second House (Y: 69 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Passed House Of Origin (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | Senate | Enacted |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Enacted |
2024-02-15 | House | Signature Requested |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Sent to Secretary of State |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Ready to Enroll |
2024-02-14 | House | LocalCertificationResolutionAdopted |
2024-02-14 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 2 |
2024-02-14 | House | Third Reading in Second House |
2024-02-13 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-02-13 | House | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-02-08 | House | Pending House Local Legislation |
2024-02-08 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Local Legislation |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 7 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Pending Senate Local Legislation |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Local Legislation |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
HB108 (Same As) 2024-02-06 - Pending House Local Legislation