AL SB29 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-15 - Pending third reading on day 21 Favorable from County and Municipal Government
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-15 - Pending third reading on day 21 Favorable from County and Municipal Government
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Class 8 municipalities, weeds, abatement, alternative procedures to declare a public nuisance after prior abatement
Title
Class 8 municipalities, weeds, abatement, alternative procedures to declare a public nuisance after prior abatement
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Ward [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | House | Pending third reading on day 21 Favorable from County and Municipal Government |
2019-05-15 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-30 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Engrossed |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 457 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Ward motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 456 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Governmental Affairs Amendment Offered |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |