AL SB297 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-20 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-20 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Precious Metal Bullion, exchange excludes net gain from gross income, grants net capital loss deduction from gross income
Title
Precious Metal Bullion, exchange excludes net gain from gross income, grants net capital loss deduction from gross income
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Melson [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Roll Call 1123 (Y: 100 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-07 - House - Third Reading in Second House (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Roll Call 859 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - Senate - Melson motion to Adopt - Roll Call 858 VXCJLVP-1 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - Senate - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-07 - House - Third Reading in Second House (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Roll Call 859 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - Senate - Melson motion to Adopt - Roll Call 858 VXCJLVP-1 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - Senate - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-20 | Senate | Enacted |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Enacted |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2024-05-07 | House | Signature Requested |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Ready to Enroll |
2024-05-07 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 1123 |
2024-05-07 | House | Third Reading in Second House |
2024-05-02 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-05-01 | House | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-04-30 | House | Pending House Ways and Means Education |
2024-04-30 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means Education |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Engrossed |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 859 |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Melson motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 858 VXCJLVP-1 |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Finance and Taxation Education 1st Substitute Offered VXCJLVP-1 |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Finance and Taxation Education 1st Substitute VXCJLVP-1 |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee in House of Origin to Senate Finance and Taxation Education |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Pending Senate Finance and Taxation General Fund |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |