AL SB298 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Greene County; county racing commission, further provided; simulcast racing, pari-mutuel wagering, further provided
Title
Greene County; county racing commission, further provided; simulcast racing, pari-mutuel wagering, further provided
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-25 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Roll Call 804 (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-02 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-05-01 | House | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-04-30 | House | Re-referred to Committee in Second House to House Economic Development and Tourism |
2024-04-30 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-30 | House | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-04-25 | House | Pending House Local Legislation |
2024-04-25 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Local Legislation |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 804 |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee in House of Origin |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Pending Senate Local Legislation |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Local Legislation |