AL SB299 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Legislature; expenditure of funds further provided for; certain employee reimbursement authorized; access to buildings and roads further provided for
Title
Legislature; expenditure of funds further provided for; certain employee reimbursement authorized; access to buildings and roads further provided for
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Roll Call 589 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Singleton motion to Adopt - Roll Call 588 FXVGD5C-1 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Singleton motion to Adopt - Roll Call 588 FXVGD5C-1 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-24 | House | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-04-18 | House | Pending House State Government |
2024-04-18 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on State Government |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Engrossed |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 589 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Singleton motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 588 FXVGD5C-1 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Singleton 1st Substitute Offered FXVGD5C-1 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Pending Senate County and Municipal Government |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on County and Municipal Government |