AL SB315 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Re-referred to Committee in Second House to House Ways and Means Education
Hearing: May 1 @ 9:00 am in Room 200
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Re-referred to Committee in Second House to House Ways and Means Education
Hearing: May 1 @ 9:00 am in Room 200
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Alabama Rural, Agribusiness, and Opportunity Zone Jobs Act; certain state matching capital loans authorized, subject to appropriation
Title
Alabama Rural, Agribusiness, and Opportunity Zone Jobs Act; certain state matching capital loans authorized, subject to appropriation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Roll Call 682 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Re-referred to Committee in Second House to House Ways and Means Education |
2024-04-23 | House | Pending House Ways and Means General Fund |
2024-04-23 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means General Fund |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 682 |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Pending Senate Finance and Taxation General Fund |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |