AL SB319 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 11 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 11 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State agencies; settlement agreements for claims against the state restricted when funds not available
Title
State agencies; settlement agreements for claims against the state restricted when funds not available
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Roll Call 668 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-24 | House | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-04-23 | House | Pending House State Government |
2024-04-23 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means General Fund |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 668 |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Pending Senate Finance and Taxation General Fund |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |