AL SB363 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-16 - Delivered to Governor at 11:30 p.m. on May 16, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-16 - Delivered to Governor at 11:30 p.m. on May 16, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Corporations, share exchange transactions, requirements, Sec. 10A-2-11.02 am'd
Title
Corporations, share exchange transactions, requirements, Sec. 10A-2-11.02 am'd
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-17 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-04-19 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-04-19 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-16 | Delivered to Governor at 11:30 p.m. on May 16, 2012 | |
2012-05-16 | Assigned Act No. 2012-563. | |
2012-05-16 | Enrolled | |
2012-05-16 | Signature Requested | |
2012-05-16 | Passed Second House | |
2012-05-16 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1587 | |
2012-05-16 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-26 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-04-19 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Commerce and Small Business | |
2012-04-19 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 711 | |
2012-04-19 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-22 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-02-23 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |