AL SB49 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Pending third reading on day 13 Favorable from Boards, Agencies and Commissions
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Pending third reading on day 13 Favorable from Boards, Agencies and Commissions
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State Board of Respiratory Therapy, add'l consumer member appointed by Governor, Sec. 34-27B-5 am'd.
Title
State Board of Respiratory Therapy, add'l consumer member appointed by Governor, Sec. 34-27B-5 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-11 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Pending third reading on day 13 Favorable from Boards, Agencies and Commissions |
2020-03-12 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2020-02-11 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 41 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Healthcare as Favorable |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Healthcare |