AL SB60 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Ports, inland facilities; create inland port and intermodal grant fund in ADECA.
Title
Ports, inland facilities; create inland port and intermodal grant fund in ADECA.
Sponsors
Sen. Arthur Orr [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Roll Call 666 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt - Roll Call 665 3JKHVEV-1 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt - Roll Call 665 3JKHVEV-1 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-30 | House | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-04-23 | House | Pending House Ways and Means General Fund |
2024-04-23 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means General Fund |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Engrossed |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 666 |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Orr motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 665 3JKHVEV-1 |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Finance and Taxation General Fund 1st Substitute Offered 3JKHVEV-1 |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Finance and Taxation General Fund 1st Substitute 3JKHVEV-1 |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Pending Senate Finance and Taxation General Fund |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |