AL SB62 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Assigned Act No. 2022-101.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Assigned Act No. 2022-101.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Marshall Co., sheriff, use of debit or credit card provided for
Title
Marshall Co., sheriff, use of debit or credit card provided for
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-24 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 297 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 75 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-02-24 - House - HBIR: Kitchens motion to Adopt Roll Call 296 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 52 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 280 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - SBIR: Scofield motion to Adopt Roll Call 279 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - HBIR: Kitchens motion to Adopt Roll Call 296 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 52 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 280 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - SBIR: Scofield motion to Adopt Roll Call 279 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2022-101. |
2022-03-01 | House | Signature Requested |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2022-02-24 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 297 |
2022-02-24 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-23 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-16 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 280 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |