AL SB70 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Pending House Ways and Means General Fund
Pending: House Ways and Means General Fund Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 10:30 am in Room 617
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Pending House Ways and Means General Fund
Pending: House Ways and Means General Fund Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 10:30 am in Room 617
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Coalition Against Domestic Violence, appropriation, operations plan and audited financial statement required, quarterly and end-of-year reports required.
Title
Coalition Against Domestic Violence, appropriation, operations plan and audited financial statement required, quarterly and end-of-year reports required.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-11 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Roll Call 473 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | House | Pending House Ways and Means General Fund |
2024-04-11 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means General Fund |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 473 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Pending Senate Finance and Taxation General Fund |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |