AL SB99 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Associations governing high school sports; subject to one-time audit by Examiners of Public Accounts
Title
Associations governing high school sports; subject to one-time audit by Examiners of Public Accounts
Sponsors
Sen. Lance Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Roll Call 318 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-10 | House | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-04-04 | House | Pending House State Government |
2024-04-04 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on State Government |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 318 |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Pending Senate Education Policy |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Education Policy |