AR HB1011 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-04 - Notification that HB1011 is now Act 21
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-04 - Notification that HB1011 is now Act 21
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Give The Department Of Higher Education The Authority To Approve A Scholarship Hold For Up To Twenty-four (24) Months For Most Scholarship Programs.
Title
To Give The Department Of Higher Education The Authority To Approve A Scholarship Hold For Up To Twenty-four (24) Months For Most Scholarship Programs.
Sponsors
Rep. Nate Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-01-29 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-04 | House | Notification that HB1011 is now Act 21 |
2015-01-29 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2015-01-29 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2015-01-29 | House | Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. |
2015-01-27 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1 |
2015-01-26 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2015-01-26 | House | Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed as amended, amendment #1. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2015-01-22 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2015-01-20 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2015-01-15 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2015-01-13 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-01-13 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2015-01-13 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2015-01-12 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2014-12-15 | House | Filed |