AR HB1011 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - Notification that HB1011 is now Act 152
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - Notification that HB1011 is now Act 152
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning The Arkansas Department Of Aeronautics Fund.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning The Arkansas Department Of Aeronautics Fund.
Sponsors
Rep. Logan Jett [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | House | Notification that HB1011 is now Act 152 |
2019-02-14 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2019-02-13 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2019-02-13 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2019-02-04 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-01-30 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-01-30 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2019-01-30 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2019-01-29 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2019-01-14 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE |
2018-11-28 | House | Filed |