AR HB1012 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-06 - WITHDRAWN BY AUTHOR
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-06 - WITHDRAWN BY AUTHOR
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Provide For Jurisdictional Cooperation Regarding Arrests, Searches, And Seizures By Federal Employees.
Title
To Provide For Jurisdictional Cooperation Regarding Arrests, Searches, And Seizures By Federal Employees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-06 | House | WITHDRAWN BY AUTHOR |
2013-01-16 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-01-16 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-01-16 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-01-14 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2012-12-04 | House | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2013R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=HB1012 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2013R/Bills/HB1012.pdf |