AR HB1014 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-08 - House Notification that HB1014 is now Act 12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-08 - House Notification that HB1014 is now Act 12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
The Nick Bacon Remembrance Act: To Allow A Veteran Designation On Driver's Licenses And Identification Cards; To Declare An Emergency.
Title
The Nick Bacon Remembrance Act: To Allow A Veteran Designation On Driver's Licenses And Identification Cards; To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-03 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-08 | House Notification that HB1014 is now Act 12 | |
2011-02-03 | House Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. | |
2011-02-03 | House TO BE ENROLLED | |
2011-02-03 | House Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. | |
2011-02-02 | House Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 | |
2011-02-02 | Senate Returned To the House as passed as amended. | |
2011-02-02 | Senate EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED | |
2011-02-02 | Senate Read the third time and passed. | |
2011-02-01 | Senate REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | |
2011-02-01 | Senate Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. | |
2011-01-31 | Senate Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 | |
2011-01-25 | Senate Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Transportation, Technology and Legislative Affairs | |
2011-01-25 | Senate Received from the House. | |
2011-01-25 | House EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED | |
2011-01-25 | House Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. | |
2011-01-19 | House Returned by the Committee Do Pass | |
2011-01-13 | House REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | |
2011-01-13 | House Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. | |
2011-01-13 | House Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. | |
2011-01-10 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on House Committee on Aging, Children and Youth, Legislative & Military Affairs | |
2010-11-23 | House Prefiled |