AR HB1051 | 2024 | 94th General Assembly Fiscal
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 30 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 30 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
An Act For The State Board Of Election Commissioners Appropriation For The 2024-2025 Fiscal Year.
Title
An Act For The State Board Of Election Commissioners Appropriation For The 2024-2025 Fiscal Year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-30 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - Third Reading (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - Third Reading (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2024-04-30 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2024-04-30 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Returned to the House as Passed. |
2024-04-30 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2024-04-25 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2024-04-25 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2024-04-24 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2024-04-23 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2024-04-23 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2024-04-23 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2024-04-10 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE |
2024-04-02 | House | Filed |