AR HB1114 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Died on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]

Summary

To Create The Parent-child Intrastate Relocation Act; To Provide Factors For A Court To Consider When Determining Whether Or Not A Change Of A Child’s Principal Place Of Residence Is In The Child’s Best Interest.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Create The Parent-child Intrastate Relocation Act; To Provide Factors For A Court To Consider When Determining Whether Or Not A Change Of A Child’s Principal Place Of Residence Is In The Child’s Best Interest.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-25 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 32 N: 43 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24HouseDied on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment
2019-04-02HouseRe-referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-04-02HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-04-02HouseAmendment No. 3 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-04-02HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-02-25HouseMotion to Expunge HB1114 Vote Failed
2019-02-25HouseRead the third time and failed.
2019-02-19HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-02-11HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-02-11HouseAmendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-02-11HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-02-04HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-02-04HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-02-04HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-01-14HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-01-07HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback